California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2010

Enrolled

Bill October 11, 2010

Chaptered

Bill October 19, 2010

Amended

Bill October 6, 2010
Bill April 19, 2010