LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1624
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1624
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1624
Compare Versions
AB1624 Chaptered October 8, 2010
AB1624 Enrolled October 7, 2010
AB1624 Amended October 6, 2010
AB1624 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1624 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1624 Chaptered October 8, 2010
AB1624 Enrolled October 7, 2010
AB1624 Amended October 6, 2010
AB1624 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1624 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare