|
10/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
10/19/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 7136.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 7136.)
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 5222.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 5233.)
|
|
|
|
10/06/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 7. Page 4808.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4592.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|