LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1629
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1629
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1629
Compare Versions
AB1629 Chaptered October 19, 2010
AB1629 Enrolled October 11, 2010
AB1629 Amended October 6, 2010
AB1629 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1629 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1629 Chaptered October 19, 2010
AB1629 Enrolled October 11, 2010
AB1629 Amended October 6, 2010
AB1629 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1629 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare