|
09/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 5123.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4976.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 7. Page 4812.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4592.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|