|
06/21/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 31. Page 5587.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 42. Noes 24. Page 5588.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4712.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|