LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1642
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1642
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1642
Action History
05/28/2010
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/28/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
04/14/2010
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 13).
03/22/2010
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
03/18/2010
Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
01/12/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
01/11/2010
Read first time. To print.