|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5850.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4059.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3945.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4853.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|