06/23/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
06/21/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/06/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4813.) | |||
04/21/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |||
04/15/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
01/13/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | |||
01/12/2010 | Read first time. To print. |