05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/14/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 24). | |||
02/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/11/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/21/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/13/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | |||
01/12/2010 | Read first time. To print. |