|
08/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4308.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4975.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|