02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/06/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
01/29/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | |||
01/28/2009 | Read first time. To print. |