|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 5417.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|