|
07/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4092.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|