|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 416, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3185.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2209.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1832.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. (Corrected January 29.)
|
|
|
|
01/28/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|