|
07/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 54, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4056.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 15).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4452.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 22).
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|