04/20/2010 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 20.) | |||
04/13/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/02/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
01/20/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. | |||
01/19/2010 | Read first time. To print. |