LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1663
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1663
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1663
Action History
03/23/2010
In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
03/16/2010
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/02/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
01/27/2010
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
01/20/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
01/19/2010
Read first time. To print.