|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4203.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5236.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected May 13.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 11).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|