BILL NUMBER: AB 1670CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 448 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beall (Principal coauthor: Senator Alquist) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Coto, De Leon, and Jeffries) JANUARY 20, 2010 An act to amend Sections 382 and 430 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1670, Beall. State Highway Routes 82 and 130: relinquishment. Existing law gives the Department of Transportation full possession and control of all state highways. Existing law describes the authorized routes in the state highway system and establishes a process for adoption of a highway on an authorized route by the California Transportation Commission. Existing law also authorizes the commission to relinquish certain state highway segments to local agencies. This bill would authorize the commission to relinquish to the City of San Jose specified portions of State Highway Routes 82 and 130, under certain conditions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 382 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 382. (a) Route 82 is from Route 101 near Blossom Hill Road in San Jose to Route 280 in San Francisco. (b) Upon a determination by the commission that it is in the best interests of the state to do so, the commission may, upon terms and conditions approved by it, relinquish to the City of San Jose the portion of Route 82 from Route 101 to Route 880 in that city, if the department and the city enter into an agreement providing for that relinquishment. The following conditions shall apply upon relinquishment: (1) The relinquishment shall become effective on the date following the county recorder's recordation of the relinquishment resolution containing the commission's approval of the terms and conditions of the relinquishment. (2) On and after the effective date of the relinquishment, the relinquished portion of Route 82 shall cease to be a state highway. (3) The portion of Route 82 relinquished under this subdivision shall be ineligible for future adoption under Section 81. (4) The City of San Jose shall ensure the continuity of traffic flow on the relinquished portion of Route 82, including any traffic signal progression. (5) For the portion of Route 82 that is relinquished under this subdivision, the City of San Jose shall install and maintain within the jurisdiction of the city signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 82 to the extent deemed necessary by the department. SEC. 2. Section 430 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 430. (a) Route 130 is from Route 101 in San Jose to Route 33 near Patterson via the vicinity of Mount Hamilton. (b) Upon a determination by the commission that it is in the best interests of the state to do so, the commission may, upon terms and conditions approved by it, relinquish to the City of San Jose the portion of Route 130 within the city limits of the City of San Jose, if the department and the city enter into an agreement providing for that relinquishment. The following conditions shall apply upon relinquishment: (1) The relinquishment shall become effective on the date following the county recorder's recordation of the relinquishment resolution containing the commission's approval of the terms and conditions of the relinquishment. (2) On and after the effective date of the relinquishment, the relinquished portion of Route 130 shall cease to be a state highway. (3) The portion of Route 130 relinquished under this subdivision shall be ineligible for future adoption under Section 81. (4) The City of San Jose shall ensure the continuity of traffic flow on the relinquished portion of Route 130, including any traffic signal progression. (5) For the portion of Route 130 that is relinquished under this subdivision, the City of San Jose shall install and maintain within the jurisdiction of the city signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 130.