|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 535, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:55 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 6630.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4769.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 5139.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|