|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6418.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4604.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 4).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5044.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|