02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
03/23/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/18/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |||
01/29/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | |||
01/28/2009 | Read first time. To print. |