California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1684 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/09/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1684CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 55 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 9, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 9, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 24, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MARCH 22, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jeffries JANUARY 26, 2010 An act to amend Section 325 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1684, Jeffries. Civil actions: adverse possession. Existing law requires that a person claiming title in an action for adverse possession show that the land has been occupied and claimed for the period of 5 years continuously, and the party or person, their predecessors and grantors have paid all taxes, as provided. This bill would require that timely payment of those taxes be established by certified records of the county tax collector. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 325 of the Code of Civil Procedure is amended to read: 325. (a) For the purpose of constituting an adverse possession by a person claiming title, not founded upon a written instrument, judgment, or decree, land is deemed to have been possessed and occupied in the following cases only: (1) Where it has been protected by a substantial enclosure. (2) Where it has been usually cultivated or improved. (b) In no case shall adverse possession be considered established under the provision of any section of this code, unless it shall be shown that the land has been occupied and claimed for the period of five years continuously, and the party or persons, their predecessors and grantors, have timely paid all state, county, or municipal taxes that have been levied and assessed upon the land for the period of five years during which the land has been occupied and claimed. Payment of those taxes by the party or persons, their predecessors and grantors shall be established by certified records of the county tax collector.