LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1685
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1685
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1685
Action History
04/20/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/12/2010
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
04/08/2010
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
01/27/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
01/26/2010
Read first time. To print.