05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). | |||
04/21/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/19/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/27/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | |||
01/26/2010 | Read first time. To print. |