|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 190, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6090.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4373.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4820.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|