|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2115.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 982.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|