08/16/2010 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |||
06/29/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/28/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). | |||
06/16/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/05/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/05/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 4446.) | |||
03/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
03/23/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
03/22/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 16). | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
01/28/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |||
01/27/2010 | Read first time. To print. |