|
08/17/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4308.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4820.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|