06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/03/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 5494.) | |||
06/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/19/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/02/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |||
02/01/2010 | Read first time. To print. |