|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 211, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2924.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2023.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2027.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1941.).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|