|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5460.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|