|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4820.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|