05/10/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/19/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
03/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/11/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/02/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |||
02/01/2010 | Read first time. To print. |