|
10/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5010.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 5421.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 5427.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 30. Page 4816.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ammiano.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|