|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 362, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6382.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4586.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4687.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 7).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 5.) Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|