|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6299.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4497.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 5139.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|