|
07/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 5910.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 5910.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 4194.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4194.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5400.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|