06/21/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5148.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 5). | |||
02/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/24/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/03/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |||
02/02/2010 | Read first time. To print. |