|
07/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 119, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5844.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4056.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4598.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|