04/28/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 20). | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/11/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/03/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |||
02/02/2010 | Read first time. To print. |