|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3363.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2403.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Senate. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 2382.) Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor. Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2844.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1981.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1627.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|