|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4941.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|