LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1722
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1722
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1722
Action History
04/20/2010
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
04/13/2010
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
02/11/2010
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
02/04/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
02/03/2010
Read first time. To print.