|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6218.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4459.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4794.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|