|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5140.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|