|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6155.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4409.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5052.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E.,R. & S.S. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|