California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1729 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/24/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1729CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 237 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Yamada (Principal coauthor: Senator Correa) FEBRUARY 3, 2010 An act to amend Section 18974.5 of the Government Code, relating to civil service examinations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1729, Yamada. Civil service examinations: veterans' preference. Under the State Civil Service Act, veterans of the Armed Forces who take an entrance examination for state employment are allowed extra points by virtue of their status as veterans. Existing law provides that if a member of the Armed Forces successfully passes a state civil service examination and becomes qualified for the veterans' preference within 6 months after the establishment of the employment list, he or she is entitled to receive the additional points at that time. This bill would extend the time in which a member of the Armed Forces may receive the additional points to 12 months after the establishment of the employment list. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18974.5 of the Government Code is amended to read: 18974.5. Any member of the Armed Forces who successfully passes any state civil service examination and whose name as a result is placed on an employment list and who within 12 months after the establishment of the employment list for which the examination was given qualifies for veterans' preference as provided for in Sections 18973 and 18973.1 shall be allowed the appropriate veterans' credit to the same effect as though he or she were entitled to that credit at the time of the establishing of the employment list. When and if that person is allowed veterans' credit under this section his or her name shall be placed on the employment list in accordance with Section 18937 as the employment list stands at the time of qualifying for veterans' credit.