LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1733
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1733
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1733
Action History
05/28/2010
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/21/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
04/13/2010
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
03/24/2010
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 23).
02/18/2010
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
02/05/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
02/04/2010
Read first time. To print.